Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/05/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/05/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/05/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/07/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/18/2003