Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/20/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/20/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/14/2003