Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/19/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/26/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/03/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/30/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/10/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/10/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/28/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/30/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/02/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/31/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/31/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/31/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/03/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/07/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/19/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/16/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2004