Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/01/2003