Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/18/2004