There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to change the requirements for naturalization to citizenship through service in the Armed Forces of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/06/2003Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims
04/28/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/13/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/18/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/18/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/18/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/18/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/18/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/18/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/25/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/09/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/23/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/13/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims04/28/2003 Referred to
05/06/2003 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1275.


Subjects (17)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2003)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act respecting naturalization through service in the armed forces to: (1) reduce the required service from three years to two years; and (2) prohibit the imposition of a naturalization fee.

Provides for overseas naturalization proceedings for members of the armed forces.