Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/18/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/18/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/18/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/18/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/18/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/18/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/18/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/25/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/09/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/09/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/23/2003