Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/01/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/09/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/20/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/21/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/02/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/02/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/2003