Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/16/2004