Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/29/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/05/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/05/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/05/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/05/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/14/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/14/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/14/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/14/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/05/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/16/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/19/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/19/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/20/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/04/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/10/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/10/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/24/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/06/2004