There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title VI of the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 to establish a Federal renewable energy portfolio standard for certain retail electric utilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/13/2003Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E455-456)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/19/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/31/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/31/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/31/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/07/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/13/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality03/24/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1294.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1294. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2003)

Amends the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 to prescribe guidelines for a Federal Renewable Portfolio Standard under which retail electric suppliers submit renewable energy credits to the Secretary.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) encourage federally-owned utilities, municipally-owned utilities, and rural electric cooperatives that sell electric energy to electric consumers for purposes other than resale to participate in the renewable portfolio standard program; and (2) establish, not later than December 31, 2005, a State renewable energy account program.