There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Columbia Orbiter Memorial Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Columbia Orbiter Memorial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the construction at Arlington National Cemetery of a memorial to the crew of the Columbia Orbiter.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/08/2003Committee on Science discharged.
04/08/2003Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-62, Part I.
03/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
04/12/2003Provisions of Measure Incorporated in H.R.1559, Title III..
04/08/2003Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 40.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Committee on Science discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003House Committee on Science Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than April 8, 2003.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-62, Part I.
04/03/2003Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
04/03/2003Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/26/2003Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/26/2003Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/25/2003Committee Hearings Held.
03/13/2003Referred to House Science
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/13/2003 Referred to
04/03/2003 Markup by
04/08/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-62
House Science03/13/2003 Referred to
03/25/2003 Hearings by
03/26/2003 Markup by
04/08/2003 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1297. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (04/08/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the House on March 13, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Columbia Orbiter Memorial Act - Directs the Secretary of the Army to construct in Arlington National Cemetery, Virginia, a memorial marker honoring the seven members of the crew of the Columbia Orbiter who died on February 1, 2003, during the landing of space shuttle mission STS-107.

Authorizes the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration to: (1) accept gifts and donations for that or another memorial or monument to the crew; and (2) transfer any donations accepted to the Secretary for the Arlington National Cemetery memorial.