Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
05/27/2003 Became Public Law No: 108-25.
05/27/2003 Signed by President.
05/23/2003 Presented to President.
05/21/2003 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
05/16/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/01/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 375 - 41 (Roll no. 158).
04/07/2003 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 108-60.
03/17/2003 Introduced in House