Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 01/29/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/29/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/29/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/29/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/29/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/29/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/29/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/29/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 01/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/29/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/29/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/29/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 01/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/05/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/05/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/05/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/05/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/05/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/07/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/07/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/07/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/07/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/07/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/12/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/12/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/12/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/12/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/12/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/12/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/12/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/12/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/12/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/12/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/12/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/12/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/12/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/12/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 02/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/13/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/25/2003