Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/11/2004