Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/11/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/23/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/25/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/21/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/21/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/05/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/11/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/16/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/25/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/31/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/02/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/14/2004