Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/31/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/01/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/03/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/17/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/02/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/12/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/12/2004