Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/07/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/01/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/02/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2004