Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/19/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/29/2003