Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/18/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/07/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/17/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/05/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/23/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/23/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/01/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/28/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/28/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/28/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/05/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/05/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/19/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/13/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/16/2004