Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/10/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/25/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004