There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Educational Opportunities Enhancement Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend the period over which an individual must make payment to the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to become entitled to educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill, to prospectively permit any servicemember to withdraw an election not to enroll under the Montgomery GI Bill, and to provide for certain servicemembers to become eligible for educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/18/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/07/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Total Force.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/07/2003Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
03/18/2003Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2003Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2003Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/18/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/01/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/18/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits04/24/2003 Referred to
House Armed Services03/18/2003 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Total Force04/07/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1328.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1328. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/18/2003)

Veterans Educational Opportunities Enhancement Act of 2003 - Amends Federal veterans' benefits provisions to allow the basic pay reduction for entitlement to veterans educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill to be taken over two years (currently one year).

Allows the withdrawal of an election not to receive such assistance during a specified open period for an individual who: (1) first becomes a member or enters into active service on or after the enactment of this Act; (2) continues to serve the period of obligated service without a service break; (3) before completing such period, is discharged or released from duty for a service-connected disability, a preexisting medical condition, a hardship, a physical or mental condition that did not result from the individual's own willful misconduct, or for the convenience of the Government; (4) completes the requirements of a secondary school diploma or equivalency certificate or 12 semester hours toward a standard college degree; and (5) is discharged honorably or placed on one of specified retirement lists. Provides a basic pay reduction for entitlement to such assistance.

Provides an opportunity for certain active-duty military personnel who first became a member of the armed forces before July 1, 1985, to enroll for such assistance during an open period under eligibility requirements very similar to those above, and requires a similar basic pay reduction for such assistance.