Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/06/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/19/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/06/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/21/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/28/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew