Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/31/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/31/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/09/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/04/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/30/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/07/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/17/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/30/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/17/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/17/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/10/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/10/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 02/10/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/10/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/10/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/02/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/17/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/01/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/01/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/15/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/12/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/12/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/21/2004