Refine your search

Showing 13 of 13 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/03/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-446.
12/03/2004 Signed by President.
11/30/2004 Presented to President.
11/19/2004 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent Vote.(consideration: CR 11/20/2004 S11653-11660)
11/19/2004 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 397 - 3 (Roll no. 537).
11/17/2004 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 108-779 filed.(text of conference report: CR H9895-9959)
11/17/2004 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
10/08/2004 To conference: On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.
05/13/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate H.R. 1350 in lieu of S.1248 with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 3. Record Vote Number: 94.(text: CR S5411-5451)
05/13/2004 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/30/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 251 - 171 (Roll no. 154).
04/29/2003 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 108-77.
03/19/2003 Introduced in House