Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/25/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/25/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/26/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/02/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/09/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/28/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2004