Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/31/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/31/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/31/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/10/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/10/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/23/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/31/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/31/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2004