Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/20/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/03/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/10/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/11/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/30/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/18/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/29/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/07/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/17/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/2004