Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/19/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/30/2003