Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/25/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/30/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/26/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/17/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/17/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/24/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/05/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/30/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/07/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/17/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/18/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/19/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/21/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/28/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/03/2004