Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/19/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/19/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/19/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/19/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/02/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/25/2004