Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/12/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/09/2004