There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Living Organ Donor Job Security Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 and title 5, United States Code, to allow leave for individuals who provide living organ donations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/02/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/20/2003Referred to House Administration
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/27/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/03/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/20/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/14/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform03/20/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization04/02/2003 Referred to
House Administration03/20/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1381.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1381. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/2003)

Living Organ Donor Job Security Act of 2003 - Amends the Family and Medical Leave Act of 1993 to allow leave for living organ donation. Includes among authorized leave time spent for: (1) tests for medical suitability of the eligible employee; (2) physical, psychological, and social evaluations of the donor; (3) pre-transplant outpatient services; (4) post-operative inpatient and outpatient transplantation services; (5) travel in connection with such tests, evaluations, and services; and (6) recuperation.