Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/27/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/03/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004