Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/30/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/08/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/14/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/14/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/19/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/21/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/18/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/18/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/19/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/19/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/23/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/23/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/23/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/25/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/25/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/05/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/16/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/16/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/23/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/23/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/07/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/07/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/15/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/15/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/15/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/21/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/21/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/27/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/27/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/27/2004