Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/08/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/10/2003