There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to permit additional States to enter into long-term care partnerships under the Medicaid Program in order to promote the use of long-term care insurance.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/20/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/10/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/20/2003Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/18/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 11/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/24/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/14/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/06/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/20/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/10/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1406.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1406. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/2003)

Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to permit additional States to enter into long-term care partnerships to promote the use of long-term care insurance.