Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 03/20/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/18/2003