Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/27/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/27/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/11/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/19/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/16/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/14/2004