Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/03/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/03/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/18/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2004