Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/26/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/26/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/26/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/26/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/07/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/07/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/07/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/07/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/07/2003