Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/30/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-419.
11/30/2004 Signed by President.
11/20/2004 Presented to President.
11/17/2004 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 532).
10/06/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2004 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/03/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 37).(text: CR H762-769)
01/30/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-408.
03/25/2003 Introduced in House