Committees: H.R.1417 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/25/2003 Referred to
01/30/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-408
09/24/2003 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property03/25/2003 Referred to
05/20/2003 Reported by
05/20/2003 Markup by
04/01/2003 Hearings by
Senate Judiciary03/04/2004 Referred to
09/29/2004 Reported by
09/21/2004 Markup by