Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/19/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/08/2003