Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/27/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/01/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/09/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/22/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/08/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/19/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/07/2004