Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/25/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/06/2004