Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/25/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/21/2004