There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

One Strike and You're Out! Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect tenants in public housing and housing assisted under the rental assistance program under section 8 of the United States Housing Act of 1937 who are victims from eviction by reason of criminal activity.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/25/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/10/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/25/2003Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/25/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/26/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/26/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/03/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/07/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/07/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/10/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/02/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/25/2003 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity04/10/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1429.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1429. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/25/2003)

One Strike and You're Out Act of 2003 - Amends the United States Housing Act of 1937, with respect to public housing and section 8 assisted housing, to provide for: (1) criminal activity eviction protections for victims of domestic or date violence; and (2) public housing agency reporting of evictions for domestic and dating violence.