Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/26/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/26/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/26/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/31/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/03/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/07/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/07/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/07/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/10/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/02/2004