Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/25/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/11/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/09/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/17/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/27/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/26/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/28/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/16/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/16/2004